HB1010

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lierman

Status:

Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 1/31/2017


Synopsis:Establishing the Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board; requiring the Administration to prepare a specified comprehensive multimodal transit development plan; requiring the Administration to establish the Citizens Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration, the MARC Riders Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration, and the Accessible Transportation Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration; requiring the Administration to submit a report to the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Lierman, Gaines, Beidle, B. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Clippinger, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Lafferty, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Platt, B. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, and Waldstreicher
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0546 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Auditors and Audits
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Commuters -see also- Car Pools
Electronic Government
Legislative Services, Department of
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(7-204, 7-205, 7-213, 7-214, 7-215, 7-216)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 24, 2017 11:38 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20162/15/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20163/19/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/19/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments {460910/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (84-51)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/11/20164/5/2016Favorable with Amendments {487376/165
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 65
4/11/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments {487376/166
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 66
Favorable with Amendments {487376/166
Committee Amendment Adopted66
Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 66
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/11/20164/7/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 67
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-29)67
Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15)67
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29)67
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (26-19)67
House4/11/20164/9/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments72
Third Reading Passed (87-51)72
Passed Enrolled72
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House1/11/20171/11/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/17/20171/17/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/24/20171/24/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 24, 2017 11:38 A.M.