Bail

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0029
    (SB0554)
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust ActDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0382
    (SB0182)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0537Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public DefenderChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0631
    (SB1030)
Forfeiture of Bail BondsDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0746Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No-Bail Status - Comprehensive Evidence-Based Risk AssessmentDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1003Criminal Procedure - Individual With Immigration Detainer (Maryland Law Enforcement and Public Safety Trust Act)Delegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1186Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2014 - 3:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1232
    (SB0973)
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing SystemDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1245
    (SB0922 / CH0205)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationDelegate Valentino-SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1277Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1294
    (SB0757)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0182
    (HB0382)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0260Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0554
    (HB0029)
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust ActSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0748Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioner - Initial AppearanceSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0757
    (HB1294)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0920Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0922 / CH0205
    (HB1245)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0973
    (HB1232)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and ReleaseSenator FroshIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1030
    (HB0631)
Forfeiture of Bail BondsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1114Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public DefenderSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2014 11:40 A.M.