Cannabis

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0379
    (SB0949)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of MarijuanaDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)Judiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0487
    (SB0267)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Composition and LicensesDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0657Cannabis - Use of State RevenuesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0973
    (SB0787)
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - LocationDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1185
    (SB0928)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1186
    (SB0927)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1236
    (SB0891)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1259
    (SB1038)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower LicensesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1429
    (SB0788)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower LicensesDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1443
    (SB0999)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActDelegate GlennIn the House - House Concur - Senate AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1474Office of Health OccupationsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1482Health - Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, and Dispensary Licenses - Sale or Transfer and ForfeitureDelegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1501Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Grower and Processor Licenses and Local Impact GrantsDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1648Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - DiversityDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1655Medical Cannabis - Certifying Providers - Written CertificationsDelegate JalisiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0068Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical CannabisSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0267
    (HB0487)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Composition and LicensesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0445Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0787
    (HB0973)
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - LocationSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0788
    (HB1429)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower LicensesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0800Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses - Review of ApplicationsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0891
    (HB1236)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0927
    (HB1186)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0928
    (HB1185)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0949
    (HB0379)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of MarijuanaSenator SmithIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0999
    (HB1443)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1038
    (HB1259)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower LicensesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1107Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses - MaximumSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1197Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and StudiesSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

April 19, 2017 4:09 P.M.