About Publications

Publications available on this website are organized into the following categories:

"Legislative and Legal" includes publications that summarize the activity that occurred during each legislative session.

"Budget and Fiscal" includes publications that analyze and summarize the state's budget and other fiscal matters.

"Committee" includes publications that have been presented to committees or reports prepared by committees.

"Commission, Task Force, and Work Group" includes publications that have been presented to or produced by these groups.

"Other" includes all other publications.


Additional publications created by the Department of Legislative Services, mandated by legislation, or requested in the Joint Chair's Budget Report may be found in the Legislative Library & Information Services Catalog.



Publications Look Up




Publication Name ▴Published
2018 - Abnormal Effective Date InformationThis list contains the sections of the Annotated Code of Maryland that, after January 1, 2018, are subject to limited duration, delayed effective dates, or contingencies not yet met.1/1/2018
2018 - Compilation of Changes in the Public Local Laws of MarylandThis annual compilation is not an official updating of the Code of Public Local Laws, but is prepared by the Department of Legislative Services as a guide to the current status of the public local laws in Maryland's counties and Baltimore City.1/18/2018
2018 - Ethics GuideThe Legislative Ethics Guide is based on the Maryland Public Ethics Law, Title 5 of the General Provisions Article. Topics discussed in the guide include conflicts of interest, gifts, prohibited employment and compensation, and financial disclosure. Ethics opinions and forms are also included.1/10/2018
2018 - Legislative Policy Committee - Summary Reports of Committees to the Legislative Policy Committee (2017 Interim Report)The Committee's function is to coordinate and supervise generally the work of the General Assembly when it is not in session1/1/2018
2018 Regular Session - Bills Signed and/or Enacted on 02/13/2018A list of the bills signed and enacted for each session is compiled by legislative staff.2/13/2018
2018 Regular Session - Current Status Report (House)Current Status of All House Legislation Introduced2/25/2018
2018 Regular Session - Current Status Report (Senate)Current Status of All Senate Legislation Introduced2/25/2018
2018 Regular Session - Gubernatorial Appointments - Terms of Office for Statewide and Local Boards and Commissions that Expire in 2018The Department of Legislative Services compiles a list of these offices whose terms expire during the current calendar year. The offices listed include only those that require confirmation by the Senate of Maryland.1/1/2018
2018 Regular Session - Issue PapersPrior to each session, staff of the Department of Legislative Services, Office of Policy Analysis, prepare an information report on issues. This document is a compilation of the issue papers arranged by major topic.1/1/2018
2018 Regular Session - Popular Terms ListBills receiving numerous calls from the public listed by category and using popular terms.2/23/2018
2018 Regular Session - Veto Override on 01/12/2018A list of the veto overrides for each session is compiled by legislative staff.1/12/2018