About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published November 29, 2012


December 3 December 4

Issued: December 3, 2012

SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION, INTERAGENCY COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 12-2

   THURSDAY    DECEMBER 6, 2012

                                  3:00 P.M.      8th Floor
                                     to          Conference Room #1
                                  4:00 P.M.      Nancy S. Grasmick Education
                                                 Building
                                                 200 W. Baltimore Street
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  This IAC meeting is an official IAC meeting that will be conducted
                by teleconference. Topic of meeting: Baltimore City block grant

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT: Judith Guenter, Public School Construction
      Program
              Telephone: 410-767-0613
              Email: jguenter@msde.state.md.us

Issued: December 4, 2012

PENSIONS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 12-2

   WEDNESDAY   DECEMBER 12, 2012

                                  2:00 P.M.      Room 120
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Decision Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Phillip J. Anthony and Dana K. Tagalicod,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

CAMPAIGN FINANCE LAW, COMMISSION TO STUDY - Addendum Number: 12-2

   FRIDAY      DECEMBER 7, 2012

                                  3:30 P.M.      Room 130
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Change in Subject

    Subject:  Closing Remarks and Final Comments on Commission Report

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Scott D. Kennedy, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510

MARYLAND COMMUNITY HEALTH RESOURCES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 12-2

   TUESDAY     DECEMBER 11, 2012

                                  2:00 P.M.      Room 230
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  A Select Number of the Highest Scoring Health Enterprise Zone
                Applicants Will Be Invited to Present to the CHRC Board.
                Presentations are by Invitation Only

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Mark Luckner, Executive Director MD
      Community Health Resources Commission
              Telephone: 410-260-7046



December 4, 2012 3:29 P.M.