About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published January 3, 2013


January 3 January 7 January 8

Issued: January 3, 2013

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 30, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.
  Add to Board of Physicians Briefing: Department of Legislative Services

HOUSE ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 10, 2013

                                  11:00 A.M.

  Organizational Briefing

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 10, 2013

                                  11:00 A.M.
    Organizational Meeting

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 15, 2013

                                  11:00 A.M.

     Property Tax Briefing - Department of Assessments and Taxation

Issued: January 7, 2013

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 13-1

   ADDED

  SB 15     Sen Young         Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - U S
                              Route 15
                              JAN 15, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 65     Chr FIN (Dept)    Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing -
                              Electronic Delivery of Decisions
                              JAN 15, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 85     Chr FIN (Dept)    Md Port Commission - Mgt Pers Appointments -
                              Operating and Managing Port Facilities
                              JAN 15, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 79     Chr FIN (Dept)    Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory
                              Councils - Renaming and Termination
                              JAN 16, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 81     Chr FIN (Dept)    Education and Workforce Training Coordinating
                              Council for Correctional Institutions - Membership
                              JAN 16, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 82     Chr FIN (Dept)    Elevator Safety Review Board - Third-Party
                              Inspectors - Certification
                              JAN 16, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 8      Sens Astle and    Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure
            Middleton         Replacement Surcharge
                              JAN 23, 2013 2:30 PM

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 16, 2013

                                  11:00 A.M.

  TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE - Briefing by the Maryland Transportation
                                Authority on Toll Collection Issues

SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   CANCELLED

  SB 3      Sen Robey         Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increase
                              JAN 10, 2013 1:00 PM (Withdrawn by sponsor)

Issued: January 8, 2013

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 13-2

   ADDED

  SB 4      Sen Pugh          State Personnel - Applicants for Employment -
                              Criminal History Records Checks
                              JAN 17, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 80     Chr FIN (Dept)    Public Hlth - Prescription Drug Montrg Program -
                              Discl of Prescription Montrg Data
                              JAN 17, 2013 1:00 PM

  SB 83     Chr FIN (Dept)    Department of Aging - Aging and Disability
                              Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
                              JAN 17, 2013 1:00 PM

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 13-1

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 16, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing on Maryland False Health Care Claims Act

  Tom Russell, Inspector General
  Department of Health and Mental Hygiene

  Ilene Nathan, Director of Medicaid Fraud Control Unit
  Office of the Attorney General

  Shelly Martin, Supervising Attorney Medicaid Fraud Control Unit
  Office of the Attorney General

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 13-2

   ADDED

  HB 10     Del               Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation -
            Haddaway-Riccio   Sexual Abuse of a Minor
                              JAN 17, 2013 1:00 PM

  HB 22     Del               Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records
            Nathan-Pulliam    and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
                              JAN 17, 2013 1:00 PM



January 8, 2013 12:05 P.M.