About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published April 18, 2013


April 19

Issued: April 19, 2013

HEALTH AND MENTAL HYGIENE, DEPARTMENT OF - Addendum Number: 13-1

   THURSDAY    APRIL 25, 2013

                                  3:00 P.M.      Lobby Level, L-3
                                     to          Department of Health and
                                  5:00 P.M.      Mental Hygiene
                                                 201 West Preston Street
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  Public Hearing, Healthchoice 1115 Waiver Renewal

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Monchel Pridget, Dept. of Health and Mental
      Hygiene
              Telephone: 410-767-5946

MARYLAND COMMUNITY HEALTH RESOURCES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 13-2

   FRIDAY      APRIL 26, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.      Conference Call

    Subject:  Discussion and approval of the CHRC Local Health Improvement
                Coalitions (LHIC) RFP
              This call is open to the public, but participation is open only
                to Members of the Commission
              Dial in number: 866.247.6034; Conference code: 4102607046

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Mark Luckner, Executive Director MD
      Community Health Resources Commission
              Telephone: 410-260-7046



April 22, 2013 9:35 A.M.