About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published November 28, 2013


December 2 December 3 December 4

Issued: December 2, 2013

DRUG AND ALCOHOL ABUSE, SPECIAL COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 13-2

   WEDNESDAY   DECEMBER 4, 2013

                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 101
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Briefing from the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene on its
                efforts to address substance abuse. Presentation from the
                Maryland Addictions Directors Council

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Jennifer Botts or Effie Rife, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: December 3, 2013

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   THURSDAY    DECEMBER 12, 2013

                                  9:30 A.M.      Room 130
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Briefing for upcoming Session 2014

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Stanford D. Ward, Benjamin Blank, or
      Tiffany Johnson, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-841-3469 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-858-3469 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: December 4, 2013

TAX CREDIT EVALUATION COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 13-1

   WEDNESDAY   DECEMBER 11, 2013

                                  10:00 A.M.     3 West
                                                 Miller Senate Office Building
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Public Hearing on the Draft Evaluation Reports for the Enterprise
                Zone and One Maryland Tax Credits

              NOTE:  The reports are posted on the Maryland General
                       Assembly's Web site (http://mgaleg.maryland.gov) under
                       Publications/Budget & Fiscal - Other

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  J. Ryan Bishop or Robert J. Rehrmann, Dept.
      of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)



December 4, 2013 2:06 P.M.