About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published April 3, 2014


April 2 April 3 April 4 April 5 April 7

Issued: April 2, 2014

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 14-44

   THURSDAY    APRIL 3, 2014

                                  1:00 P.M.

       Working Session.

   FRIDAY      APRIL 4, 2014

                                  1:00 P.M.

       Working Session.

Issued: April 3, 2014

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 14-45

   ADDED

  HB 562    Del Howard, et    Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting
            al                and Conference Expenses
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 14-46

   ADDED

  HB 1472   Del               Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Study
            Fraser-Hidalgo,   APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM
            et al

  HB 1522   Del Reznik        Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of
                              Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

  SB 1117   Sen Jones         Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BWLT
            Rodwell           Tasting Licenses
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

HOUSE ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS - Addendum Number: 14-43

   ADDED

  SB 73     Sen Colburn       Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area -
                              Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
                              APR 3, 2014 1:00 PM

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 14-40

   THURSDAY    APRIL 3, 2014

                                  1:00 P.M.

                   Sponsor-only: HB 1555 & SB 654

MD HEALTH BENEFIT EXCHANGE, JOINT OVRST COMM ON THE - Addendum Number: 14-2

   THURSDAY    APRIL 3, 2014

                                  5:00 P.M.      Room 240
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Office of Legislative Audit Review of the Exchange Update on
                Exchange Activities
              Exchange Plans for Moving Forward After Open Enrollment

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Linda L. Stahr or Patrick D. Carlson, Dept.
      of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, DC Area)

Issued: April 4, 2014

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 14-71

   ADDED

  HB 341    Del Jameson       Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Board
                              Structure
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

HOUSE ECONOMIC MATTERS - Addendum Number: 14-39

   ADDED

  SB 1103   Sen Jones         Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C
            Rodwell           Licenses
                              APR 5, 2014 1:00 PM

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 14-44

   ADDED

  SB 699    Sen Shank, et     Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate
            al                Data - Authorized Uses
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

  SB 805    Sen Raskin, et    Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
            al                APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 14-68

   ADDED

  SB 266    Balt City Sens    Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City -
            (BCA)             Warrants
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

  SB 290    Sen Brochin,      Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection
            et al             of Members
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

  SB 469    Sen Shank, et     Maryland Income Tax Refund - Washington County -
            al                Warrants
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

  SB 1049   Sen Getty, et     Education - Required Number of School Days -
            al                Exception
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

  SB 1066   Sen Raskin, et    Fairness in Negots Act and the Public Sch Lbr Rel
            al                Bd - Sunset Rpl and Reporting Reqmts
                              APR 4, 2014 1:00 PM

Issued: April 5, 2014

LEGISLATIVE ETHICS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 14-2

   MONDAY      APRIL 7, 2014

                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 206
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Work Session to handle matters of the Joint Committee

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Deadra W. Daly or Stacy M. Goodman, Dept. o
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5200/5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5200/5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: April 7, 2014

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 14-47

   ADDED

  HB 607    Del Kaiser, et    Education - Student Data Privacy Act of 2014
            al                APR 7, 2014 2:30 PM

SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Addendum Number: 14-32

   ADDED

  HB 33     Del Smigiel       Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and
                              Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)
                              APR 7, 2014 3:30 PM

  HB 1186   Del Anderson,     Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by
            et al             Summons
                              APR 7, 2014 3:30 PM

   MONDAY      APRIL 7, 2014

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 14-45

   ADDED

  SB 454    Sen Robey, et     Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping and Prostitution -
            al                Penalty
                              APR 7, 2014 1:00 PM

  SB 940    Sen Stone         Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors
                              and Disabled and Elderly Persons
                              APR 7, 2014 1:00 PM



April 7, 2014 2:21 P.M.