About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published January 8, 2015


January 8 January 12 January 13

Issued: January 8, 2015

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 15-1

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 15, 2015

                                  2:00 P.M.

   NOTE:  The briefing by the Comptroller's Office on State Revenues has been
  moved to Tuesday, January 20 at 2:30 p.m. or immediately following the
  1:00 p.m. presentation by Mr. Zandi.

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 20, 2015

                                  2:30 P.M.

  Briefing by Andrew Schaufele of the Comptroller's Office on State Revenues

   Or immediately following the 1:00 presentation by Mr. Zandi.

HOUSE ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 15, 2015

                                  10:30 A.M.  or Immediately Following
                                                   Session

   NOTE:  RESCHEDULED DATE

  Organizational Meeting

Issued: January 12, 2015

SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 20, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  Marijuana Decriminalization -- update on policies and practices

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 15, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

                Organizational Meeting and Full Committee Briefing
                on Medicaid
                      *Room 240

Issued: January 13, 2015

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 15-2

   ADDED

  SB 4      Carroll County    Carroll County - Gaming Events
            Senators          JAN 15, 2015 2:00 PM

HOUSE ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS - Addendum Number: 15-3

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 20, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  Update from the Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission

  Presented By:  Jon Laria, Partner, Ballard Spahr LLP
                 Chair, Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 22, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing: State of the Bay

  Presented By:  Alison Prost, Maryland Executive Director,
                 Chesapeake Bay Foundation
                 Bevin Bucheister, Maryland Director,
                 Chesapeake Bay Commission

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 27, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  Update on Ground Rents

  Presented By:  Representatives from the State Department of Assessments
                 and Taxation and the Office of the Attorney General

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 28, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  Marcellus Shale Safe Drilling Initiative

  Presented By:  David Vanko, Ph.D.
                 Chair, Marcellus Shale Safe Drilling Initiative
                 Advisory Commission

  Briefing:  Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Bays -
             Powers and Duties

  Presented By:  Ren Serey, Executive Director

  Briefing:  Task Force to Study the Impact of Ocean Acidification on
             State Waters - Findings and Recommendations

  Presented By:  Eric Schwaab, Chair

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 29, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  State of the Port

  Presented By:  James White, Executive Director,
                 Maryland Port Administration

  Briefing:  Recent Legislative and Policy Advancements in Traffic Safety

  Presented By:  Maryland Department of Transportation

   TUESDAY     FEBRUARY 3, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Fiscal Briefing

  Presented By:  Warren G. Deschenaux, Director, Office of Policy Analysis,
                 Department of Legislative Services

                                  2:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  The Chesapeake Bay Foundation's Report on the Economic Benefits
             of Cleaning up the Chesapeake

  Presented By:  Spencer Phillips, Ph.D., Principal, Key-Log Economics, LLC

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 15-1

   ADDED

  HB 8      Del Rosenberg     Unfrm Act to Secur the Attndnce of Witnsses From
                              Without the St in Crim Prcdngs - News Media Prvlg
                              JAN 27, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 20     Del Glenn         Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased
                              Penalties
                              JAN 27, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 23     Del Glenn         Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse
                              Registry
                              JAN 27, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 31     Del Glenn         Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on
                              Pretrial Release
                              JAN 27, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 6      Del Glenn         Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of 3
                              Years
                              JAN 28, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 7      Del Sophocleus    Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement
                              of Reports and Records - Time Period
                              JAN 28, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 16     Del Glenn         Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on
                              Sale of Unlawful Vehicles
                              JAN 28, 2015 1:00 PM

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 15-2

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 15, 2015

                                  12:00 P.M.

  Update by the Judiciary on the Maryland Electronic Courts (MDEC)
  project and District Court Appointed Attorneys Program

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 20, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Tour of Prince George's County Correctional Center, 13400 Dille Drive,
  Upper Marlboro, Maryland 20772

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 22, 2015

                                  1:30 P.M.

  Observation of bond review hearings in the District Court for Anne Arundel
  County, 251 Rowe Boulevard, Annapolis, Maryland 21401

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 15-3

   CANCELLED

  HB 8      Del Rosenberg     Unfrm Act to Secur the Attndnce of Witnsses From
                              Without the St in Crim Prcdngs - News Media Prvlg
                              JAN 27, 2015 1:00 PM




January 13, 2015 4:47 P.M.