About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published January 15, 2015


January 15 January 16 January 19 January 20

Issued: January 15, 2015

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 15-3

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 22, 2015

                                  11:00 A.M.

  Briefing on the Developmental Disabilities Administration

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   ADDED

  SB 18     Sen Conway        State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and
                              Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
                              JAN 28, 2015 3:00 PM

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 15-4

   ADDED

  HB 14     Del O'Donnell     Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members
                              of the Armed Forces
                              FEB 4, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 27     Del McConkey      Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville
                              Hospital Center Property
                              FEB 4, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 15     Del McConkey      Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay
                              Bridge - Toll Collection
                              FEB 5, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 33     Del Vitale        Housing and Community Development - Community
                              Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects
                              FEB 10, 2015 1:00 PM

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 29, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  Administration of Toll Facilities and Video Tolling

  Presented By:  Maryland Transportation Authority

Issued: January 16, 2015

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 15-5

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 29, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  Conowingo Dam

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   ADDED

  HB 1      Del Glenn         Higher Education - Hattie N. Harrison Memorial
                              Scholarship - Establishment
                              JAN 28, 2015 2:15 PM

  HB 11     Del O'Donnell     Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial
                              Scholarship Programs - Eligibility
                              JAN 28, 2015 2:15 PM

  HB 19     Del Glenn         Truant Students - System of Active Intervention -
                              Requirements
                              JAN 28, 2015 2:15 PM

  HB 28     Del Cluster       Primary and Secondary Education - Security -
                              School Resource Officers
                              JAN 28, 2015 2:15 PM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 15-2

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 28, 2015

                                  11:00 A.M.
  Briefing: State Board of Elections

RET SCRTY FOR ALL MARYLANDERS, GOV TSK FRCE TO ENSUR - Addendum Number: 15-1

   FRIDAY      JANUARY 16, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.      Verda Welcome Hearing
                                     to          Room, 4th Floor
                                  3:00 P.M.      Miller Senate Office Building
                                                 11 Bladen St.
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Task Force Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Donni Turner or Jay Hutchins, Dept. of
      Labor, Licensing and Regulation
              Telephone: 410-800-8440

Issued: January 19, 2015

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 15-2

   ADDED

  SB 19     Sen Conway        University System of Maryland - Chancellor -
                              Appointment
                              JAN 22, 2015 2:30 PM

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 15-6

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 27, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  Forclosures

  Presented By:  Lucy Cardwell, Assistant Attorney General, Division of
                 Consumer Protection
                 Office of the Attorney General

Issued: January 20, 2015

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 15-4

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 22, 2015

                                  11:00 A.M.

  Review of the January Board of Public Works Reductions - 3 West, Miller

                                  11:10 A.M.

  Briefing on the Developmental Disabilities Administration - 3 West, Miller

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 15-3

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 21, 2015

                                  2:30 P.M.

  Briefing:  University System of Maryland Overview;  and, College Readiness and
     P-20 Updates, presented by:  William "Brit" Kirwan, Ph.D., Chancellor,
     University System of Maryland

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 15-1

   ADDED

  SB 35     Sen Brochin,      Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses
            et al             - Fees
                              FEB 3, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 40     Sen Pugh, et      Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working
            al                Families Act
                              FEB 3, 2015 1:00 PM

SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Addendum Number: 15-2

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 28, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing --  Audit Findings -- Office of the Public Defender

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 15-7

   RESCHEDULED

  HB 14     Del O'Donnell     Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members
                              of the Armed Forces
                              From FEB 4, 1:00 PM to FEB 4, 2:00 PM

  HB 27     Del McConkey      Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville
                              Hospital Center Property
                              From FEB 4, 1:00 PM to FEB 4, 2:00 PM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 15-3

   RESCHEDULED

  HB 11     Del O'Donnell     Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial
                              Scholarship Programs - Eligibility
                              From JAN 28, 2:15 PM to FEB 5, 2:15 PM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 15-4

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 20, 2015

                                  11:00 A.M.

  Briefing: Maryland Department of Transportation



January 20, 2015 3:11 P.M.