About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published April 9, 2015


April 9 April 10 April 11 April 13

Issued: April 9, 2015

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-20

   ADDED

  SB 915    Sen Jennings,     St Pers - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Vol
            et al             Fire, Resc, or Emer Med Servs Prvdrs
                              APR 9, 2015 3:00 PM

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-21

   RESCHEDULED

  SB 915    Sen Jennings,     St Pers - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Vol
            et al             Fire, Resc, or Emer Med Servs Prvdrs
                              From APR 9, 3:00 PM to APR 9, 1:00 PM

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-37

   ADDED

  HB 1161   Del Krimm, et     Ethan Saylor Center for Self-Advocates as
            al                Educators
                              APR 9, 2015 1:00 PM

   THURSDAY    APRIL 9, 2015

                                  12:00 P.M.

       Public Health & Minortity Health Disparities Subcomm
         *ADDED WORK SESSION*
         1) Mental Health - Voluntary & Involuntary Admissions -
            Assent and Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-38

   FRIDAY      APRIL 10, 2015

                                  11:00 A.M.

       Government Operations Subcommittee Work Session(s)
         1) HB 94 - Commission on African American History and
            Culture - Duties
         2) SB 51 - Commission on African American History and
            Culture - Duties
                 *Room 240*

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-39

   FRIDAY      APRIL 10, 2015

                                  11:30 A.M.

       Public Health & Minority Health Disparities Subcomm Work Sessions
         1) HB 1161 and SB 583 - Ethan Saylor Alliance for
            Self-Advocates as Educators
         2) SB 940 - Residential Child Care Programs - Statement
            of Need - Exception for Relocation
         3) SB 187 - Workgroup to Study Access to Obsteric Services
                  *Room 240*

HOUSE RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 15-5

   ADDED

  SJ 2      Sen Pinsky, et    United States Constitution - Amendments Convention
            al                - Democracy Amendment
                              APR 10, 2015 1:00 PM

Issued: April 10, 2015

HOUSE ECONOMIC MATTERS - Addendum Number: 15-40

   ADDED

  SB 934    Sens Conway       Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dlrs & Pawnbrkrs
            and McFadden      - Reqd Rcds - Photograph of Precious Metal Object
                              APR 11, 2015 9:45 AM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 15-63

   ADDED

  SB 905    Sen Kasemeyer,    Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
            et al             APR 11, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 925    Washington        Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic
            County Senators   Development Projects
                              APR 11, 2015 1:00 PM

Issued: April 11, 2015

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 15-45

   ADDED

  HB 552    Dels              Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance -
            Pendergrass and   Small Employers
            Hammen            APR 13, 2015 9:00 AM

  HB 1109   Chr HGO (Dept)    Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties,
                              and Responsibilities
                              APR 13, 2015 9:00 AM

  HB 1172   Chr HGO (Dept)    Individuals With Developmental Disabilities -
                              Providers - Licenses
                              APR 13, 2015 9:00 AM

  HB 1290   Del Adams, et     Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Pharmacy
            al                Networks
                              (Jointly assigned to FIN and B&T)
                              APR 13, 2015 9:00 AM

HOUSE ECONOMIC MATTERS - Addendum Number: 15-41

   ADDED

  HB 1231   Del               Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services
            Waldstreicher,    APR 13, 2015 9:45 AM
            et al

   NOTE  Sponsor Only

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 15-43

   ADDED

  SB 172    Sen Gladden       Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement
                              in Juvenile Facilities
                              APR 11, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 735    Sen Zirkin        Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility -
                              Requirements
                              APR 11, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 609    Sen Brochin,      State Government - Office of the Child Welfare
            et al             Ombudsman - Pilot Program
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 15-64

   ADDED

  SB 488    Sen King, et      Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and
            al                Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 562    Sen Peters        Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With
                              Disabilities
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 615    Sen Eckardt       Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation
                              Easements
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 622    Sen Currie, et    Education - English Language Learner Liaison Pilot
            al                Program
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 635    Washington        State Bd of Ed and the Prof Standards and Teacher
            County Senators   Ed Bd - Alternative Teacher Certification Program
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 923    Washington        Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled
            County Senators   Veterans
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

Issued: April 13, 2015

SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Addendum Number: 15-41

   ADDED

                           \\ IMMEDIATELY FOLLOWING FIRST SESSION

  HB 1237   Chr JUD (Dept)    Police and Correctional Training Commissions -
                              Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  HB 1279   Chr JUD (Dept)    Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information
                              Advisory Board - Members
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 15-44

   ADDED

  SB 482    Sen Ramirez,      Public Saf - Law Enforc Offcrs - Body-Worn Digital
            et al             Recording Dvc and Electronic Ctrl Dvc
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 736    Sen Reilly, et    Public Safety - Handgun Identification
            al                Requirements - Repeal
                              APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM

  SB 882    Sen Conway, et    Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
            al                APR 13, 2015 1:00 PM



April 13, 2015 12:02 P.M.