About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 15, 2015


October 16

Issued: October 16, 2015

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-2

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 27, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   MEETING CANCELED

   NOTE   Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, House
  Ways and Means Committee, and Spending Affordability Committee

    Subject:  Briefing on forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current
              and upcoming fiscal years, and out-year forecast

   WEDNESDAY   NOVEMBER 18, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, House
  Ways and Means Committee, and Spending Affordability Committee

    Subject:  Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kaitlyn Shulman, Kate Henry, or Matthew
      Jackson, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 27, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   MEETING CANCELED

   NOTE   Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, House
  Appropriations Committee, and Spending Affordability Committee

    Subject:  Briefing on forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current
              and upcoming fiscal years, and out-year forecast

   WEDNESDAY   NOVEMBER 18, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, House
  Appropriations Committee and Spending Affordability Committee

    Subject:  Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Stanford D. Ward, Benjamin Blank, or
      Tiffany Johnson, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 15-2

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 27, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD
   NOTE   MEETING CANCELED

   NOTE   Joint with Spending Affordability Committee, House
  Appropriations Committee, and Ways and Means Committee

    Subject:  Briefing on forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current
              and upcoming fiscal years, and out-year forecast.

   WEDNESDAY   NOVEMBER 18, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with Spending Affordability Committee, House
  Appropriations Committee, and Ways and Means Committee

    Subject:  Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Erika S. Schissler, Phillip S. Anthony, or
      Matthew J. Bennett, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)

SPENDING AFFORDABILITY COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 15-2

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 27, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   MEETING CANCELED

   NOTE   Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, House
  Appropriations Committee, and Ways and Means Committee

    Subject:  Briefing on forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current
              and upcoming fiscal years, and out-year forecast.

   WEDNESDAY   NOVEMBER 18, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, House
  Appropriations Committee, and Ways and Means Committee

    Subject:  Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

   WEDNESDAY   DECEMBER 16, 2015

                                  4:00 P.M.      Room 120
                                                 Appropriations Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Decision Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kaitlyn Shulman, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)



October 19, 2015 7:06 A.M.