About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 29, 2015


November 2 November 3

Issued: November 2, 2015

LEGISLATIVE INFO TECH AND OPEN GOV, JOINT COMM ON - Addendum Number: 15-2

   TUESDAY     NOVEMBER 3, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.      3 West
                                                 Miller Senate Office Building
                                                 Budget and Taxation Committee
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Subject Update

    Subject:  Update on the Office of Information Systems' recent and ongoing
              projects. Briefing on the 2015 amendments to the Maryland Public
              Information Act. Discussion of transparency in decision making.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kathryn Selle, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

MARYLAND COMMUNITY HEALTH RESOURCES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 15-2

   THURSDAY    NOVEMBER 5, 2015

                                  11:00 A.M.     Conference Call
                                                 Dial in number - 1-866-247-6034
                                                 Conference Code - 4102607046

    Subject:  Consideration of FY 2016 (this year's) Call for Proposals. This
              call is open to the public. Participation (ability to ask
              questions) will be available only to CHRC Commissioners.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Mark Luckner, Executive Director, Maryland
      Community Health Resources Commission
              Telephone: 410-260-6290

Issued: November 3, 2015

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   MONDAY      NOVEMBER 16, 2015

  TRANSPORTATION AND THE ENVIRONMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
  Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, Chair

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 120
                                     to          Appropriations Committee
                                  3:00 P.M.      House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
  (House Environment and Transportation Committee)

    Subject:  (1) Draft Consolidated Transportation Program Briefing
              (2) BaltimoreLINK System Briefing
              (3) Baltimore Regional Transit Needs Assessment Briefing

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Matt Jackson or Patrick Tracy, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 15-1

   MONDAY      NOVEMBER 16, 2015

  MOTOR VEHICLE AND TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE
  Delegate Pamela Beidle, Chair

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 120
                                     to          Appropriations Committee
                                  3:00 P.M.      House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
  (House Appropriations Committee)

    Subject:  (1) Draft Consolidated Transportation Program Briefing
              (2) BaltimoreLINK System Briefing
              (3) Baltimore Regional Transit Needs Assessment Briefing

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Matt Jackson or Patrick Tracy, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)



November 3, 2015 3:15 P.M.