About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published December 3, 2015


December 4 December 9

Issued: December 4, 2015

PUBLIC SAFETY AND POLICING WORKGROUP - Addendum Number: 15-2

   TUESDAY     DECEMBER 8, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Meeting Canceled

    Subject:  Policing Practices

   MONDAY      JANUARY 11, 2016

                                  2:00 P.M.      Joint Hearing Room
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Overview Discussion

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Shirleen Pilgrim or Claire Rossmark, Dept.
      of Legislative Services
          Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                     301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: December 9, 2015

BEHAVIORAL HEALTH AND OPIOID USE DISORDERS, JOINT - Addendum Number: 15-1

   WEDNESDAY   DECEMBER 9, 2015

                                  10:30 A.M.     Room 240
                                                 Health and Government
                                                 Operations Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Location Change

    Subject:  1) Judiciary perspectives on dealing with individuals with
                 substance use and mental health issues:
              2) Briefing from Ameritox:
              3) Final Report of the Governor's Heroin and Opioid Emergency
                 Task Force.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Erin Hopwood or David Smulski, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)



December 9, 2015 9:06 A.M.