About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published January 7, 2016


January 7

Issued: January 7, 2016

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 16-1

   ADDED

  SB 105    Chr EHE (Dept)    Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name
                              and Authority
                              JAN 19, 2016 2:30 PM

   THURSDAY    FEBRUARY 4, 2016

                                  1:00 P.M.

  Briefing:  State Board of Elections

                                  1:30 P.M.

  Briefing:  State Ethics Commission

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 16-1

   ADDED

  SB 98     Chr FIN (Dept)    Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund -
                              Distributions - Alteration
                              JAN 21, 2016 1:00 PM

SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Addendum Number: 16-1

   RESCHEDULED

  SB 81     Chr JPR (Dept)    Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of
                              Termination Date
                              From JAN 21, 2:00 PM to JAN 21, 1:30 PM

   CANCELLED

  SB 13     Sen Simonaire     Public Safety - Department of State Police -
                              Transfer of Surplus Military Property
                              JAN 21, 2016 2:00 PM

  SB 55     Sen Simonaire     Child Witness - Facility and Therapy Dogs -
                              Support
                              JAN 21, 2016 2:00 PM

  SB 64     Baltimore         Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges -
            County Senators   Compensation
                              JAN 21, 2016 2:00 PM

  SB 82     Chr JPR (Dept)    Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by
                              Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
                              JAN 21, 2016 2:00 PM

  SB 83     Chr JPR (Dept)    Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund
                              JAN 21, 2016 2:00 PM

  Note: SB 13, SB 55, SB 64, SB 82, and SB 83 have been rescheduled for a
        hearing on 01/26/2016 at 1:00 PM.

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 21, 2016

                                  2:00 P.M.

  Or immediately following the bill hearing on SB 81.

  Briefing -- Department of Juvenile Services
              - Overview
              - Update on the status of the education system for juvenile
                offenders

  Note: Time change

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 16-1

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 14, 2016

                                  11:00 A.M.

       Full Committee Briefings **Change in Time***
         1) Full Committee Informational Briefing
         2) Sunset Review of the State Board of Environmental
            Health Specialists

            *Room 240*

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 16-1

   ADDED

  HB 21     Del Haynes        Sustainable Communities Tax Credit - Residential
                              Units for Lower-Income Individuals
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

  HB 33     Del Arentz        Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

  HB 37     Del Kipke         Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Deferrals -
                              Payment Due Date
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

  HB 39     Del A. Miller     Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours
                              - Establishment
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

  HB 44     Del A. Miller     Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exmptns -
                              Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to LLC
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

  HB 49     Del Holmes        Criminal Law - Gaming - Home Games
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

  HB 53     Del O'Donnell     Presidential Elections - Agrmnt Among the Sts to
                              Elect the Pres by Natl Popular Vote - Rpl
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

  HB 55     Del Cluster       Baltimore County - Education - WhyTry Program
                              JAN 20, 2016 2:00 PM

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 19, 2016

                                  11:00 A.M.

  Briefing: Comptroller of Maryland

                                  2:00 P.M.

  Briefing: Department of Commerce

   WEDNESDAY   JANUARY 20, 2016

                                  11:00 A.M.

  Briefing: State Department of Assesments and Taxation

   THURSDAY    JANUARY 21, 2016

                                  11:00 A.M.

  Briefing: Public School Superintendents' Association of Maryland, Maryland
            Association of Community Colleges, and Maryland Association of
            Boards Of Education

                                  2:00 P.M.

  Briefing: Update on the Study of Adequacy of Funding for Education in the
            State of Maryland - Augenblick, Palaich and Associates

HEREDITARY AND CONGENITAL DISORDERS, STATE ADVISORY - Addendum Number: 16-2

   TUESDAY     JANUARY 12, 2016

                                  5:00 P.M.     Room L-2
                                     to         DHMH
                                  7:00 P.M.     201 W. Preston Street
                                                Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  Maryland Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders

              Vote on X-linked Adrenoleukodystrophy

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Deborah Badawi, Dept. of Health and Mental
      Hygiene
         Telephone: 410-767-5592



January 7, 2016 4:15 P.M.