About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published September 1, 2016


September 6

Issued: September 6, 2016

21ST CENTURY SCHOOL FACILITIES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 16-2

   THURSDAY    SEPTEMBER 15, 2016

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 120
                                     to          Appropriations Committee
                                  4:00 P.M.      House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  - Structure and funding of public school construction programs in
                other states
              - Educational specifications in Maryland
              - Cost containment alternatives
              - Public testimony (only accepted on agenda topics)

              Members of the public who wish to testify must email
              KnottCommission@mlis.state.md.us or call (410) 946-5510 to sign up
              no later than September 14, 2016, at 5:00 p.m.  There will be
              limited time for public testimony (3 minutes each), and
              individuals will be called to testify in the order in which they
              sign up.  Testimony must relate to the agenda topics noted above.
              75 copies of written testimony must be delivered to Room 120 House
              Office Building by September 15, 2016, at 12:00 noon.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kate Henry or Rachel Hise, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)



September 6, 2016 3:09 P.M.