About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published September 29, 2016


September 30 October 3

Issued: September 30, 2016

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 16-1

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 25, 2016

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 100
                                                 Judiciary Committee Hearing
                                                 Room
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Revised Subject

    Subject:  Briefing: Cell Site Simulator Technology, Historical Location
              Information, and Aerial Surveillance by Police

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Douglas R. Nestor, Lauren C. Nestor, or
      Claire E. Rossmark, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-841-3488 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-858-3488 (Washington, D.C. Area)

ENDING HOMELESSNESS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 16-1

   WEDNESDAY   OCTOBER 26, 2016

                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 120
                                                 Appropriations Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  A briefing from the Interagency Council on Homelessness

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kaitlyn Shulman or Tonya D. Zimmerman,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5500/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: October 3, 2016

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 16-1

   FRIDAY      OCTOBER 14, 2016

                                  9:30 A.M.      Deerfield Farms
                                                 164 Deerfield Farm Lane
                                                 Centreville, MD

    Subject:  Site Visit: Tour of Deerfield Farms Poultry and Grain Operations

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Laura Lodge, Patrick Tracy, and Cristen
      Flynn, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

MANAGEMENT OF PUBLIC FUNDS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON THE - Addendum Number: 16-2

   WEDNESDAY   NOVEMBER 16, 2016

                                  1:00 P.M.      William Amoss Hearing
                                                 Room
                                                 Senate Executive Nominations
                                                 Committee
                                                 4th Floor Miller Senate Office
                                                 Building
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Meeting Rescheduled

    Subject:  Update from the Comptroller and Treasurer
              Review of Local Goverment Audits by the Office of Legislative
              Audits

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Trevor S. Owen or Ben Wilhelm, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)




October 3, 2016 12:20 P.M.