About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 6, 2016


October 11 October 12

Issued: October 11, 2016

FINANCIAL EDUCATION AND CAPABILITY COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 16-1

   THURSDAY    OCTOBER 13, 2016

                                  10:00 A.M.     MDOT Headquarters
                                                 7201 Corporate Center Drive
                                                 Hanover, MD

    Subject:  An assessment of State Government Departments' and Private Sector
              financial capability programs

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Sue Rogan, MD CASH Campaign
              Telephone: 443-692-9425

Issued: October 12, 2016

PUBLIC SAFETY AND ADMINISTRATION SUBCOMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 16-37

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 18, 2016

                                  10:00 A.M.     Victor Cullen Center
                                      to
                                  12:00 P.M.

    Subject:  Site visit to the Victor Cullen Center

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Matthew Jackson, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 16-1

   FRIDAY      OCTOBER 14, 2016

                                  9:30 A.M.      Site Visits

    Subject:  Tour of Deerfield Farms Poultry and Grain Operations
              Tour of Triple Creek Winery
              Tour of Councell Farm

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Ryane M. Necessary, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)



October 12, 2016 2:02 P.M.