About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 26, 2017


October 27 October 30

Issued: October 27, 2017

JOINT COMMITTEE ON FEDERAL RELATIONS - Addendum Number: 17-2

   TUESDAY     DECEMBER 5, 2017

                                  9:30 A.M.      Room 251
                                                 House Environment and
                                                 Transportation Committee Room
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  WMATA (Metro) Financing and Governance Reform

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Laura M. Vykol or Scott D. Kennedy, Dept.
      of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

LEGISLATIVE ETHICS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 17-2

   TUESDAY     NOVEMBER 14, 2017

                                  1:00 P.M.      Conference Room 206
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Review of Disclosures and Disclaimers
              Work Session.
              A portion of the meeting may be closed to comply with a statutory
              requirement that prevents public disclosure of matters that may be
              discussed.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Deadra W. Daly or Stacy M. Goodman,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5200/5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5200/5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: October 30, 2017

MARYLAND SMALL BUSINESS RETIREMENT SAVINGS BOARD - Addendum Number: 17-2

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 31, 2017

                                  10:30 A.M.     Call in #: 866-247-6034
                                                 Code: 1769331313

   NOTE   Changed to Conference Call

    Subject: By-laws and organizational issues

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Susanne Brogan, State Treasurer's Office
              Telephone: 410-260-7533 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         800-974-0468 (Washington, D.C. Area)



October 30, 2017 3:55 P.M.