Status as of February 9, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the House - First Reading Appropriations
Status as of March 9, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 9, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the House - First Reading Appropriations
Status as of March 20, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the House - First Reading Appropriations
Status as of March 31, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of March 20, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of February 13, 1998: Bill is in the House - First Reading House Rules
Status as of March 27, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 16, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs