Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 89
Status as of March 16, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 25, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 4, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 6, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs