Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 51
Status as of February 25, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 16, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 25, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings
Status as of February 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 4, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 10, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs