Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 60
Status as of April 2, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 18, 1998: Bill is in the House - First Reading Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of January 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of January 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of January 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of January 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 10, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs