Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 47
Status as of March 9, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 16, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 27, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of April 6, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Recommit to Committee Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 24, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 2, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 17, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 9, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 27, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 25, 1998: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Commerce and Government Matters