Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 40
Status as of March 20, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of February 9, 1998: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 24, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 2, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 17, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 20, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 11, 1998: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Commerce and Government Matters