Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 123
Status as of March 24, 1998: Bill is in the House - Recommit to Committee Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 26, 1998: Bill is in the House - Recommit to Committee Environmental Matters
Status as of March 26, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 25, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings
Status as of February 4, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of April 13, 1998: Bill is in the House - Favorable with Amendments Economic Matters
Status as of April 13, 1998: Bill is in the House - Favorable with Amendments Environmental Matters
Status as of March 23, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Economic and Environmental Affairs