Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 121
Status as of March 2, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of April 10, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 16, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 27, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 30, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters