Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 12
Status as of February 23, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 17, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 9, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of April 9, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 17, 1998: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 18, 1998: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs