Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the period during which the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City must contribute certain amounts to the annual operating deficits of the Baltimore Convention facility and $200,000 each year to a capital improvement reserve fund; and extending to December 31, 2029, the date after which Baltimore City is solely responsible for all operating deficits and capital improvements for the Baltimore Convention facility.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0400
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {993629/1 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected (55-79)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-39)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {993629/1 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected (55-79) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (95-39) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page