Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Boyce, Guyton, Lehman, Ruth, Stein, and Stewart
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing inspection and reporting requirements for certain permit holders; requiring the Department of the Environment maintain on its website a list of certain noncompliant permit holders and provide certain Senators and Delegates with a link to the list by monthly e-mail; establishing administrative penalties for certain permit holders determined to be in significant noncompliance of certain State or federal water quality standards, effluent limitations, or other requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {393927/1 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {483926/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-26)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {373023/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Grammer) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Floor Amendment {393927/1 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-40) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {143828/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Floor Amendment {483926/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-26) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Text - Chapter - Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page