Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Beitzel, Buckel, Carey, McComas, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain qualified expenses if the individual harvests an antlerless deer and donates the deer meat to a venison donation program administered by a federally tax-exempt organization; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly on the effectiveness of the tax credit, including the number of deer donated and the total cost of the tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017, but before January 1, 2023; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0182
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/15/2017
Legislative Date
8/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {415467/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/15/2017 8/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {415467/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page