Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grant Distribution
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a certain portion of the local impact grants distributed to Prince George's County from proceeds of video lottery terminals are to be distributed to the Town of Forest Heights in fiscal years 2018 through 2020.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1563 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/19/2017
Legislative Date
7/19/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/19/2017 7/19/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grant Distribution
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page