Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel Recruitment Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Beitzel, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Hartman, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the recruitment and appointment process for certain positions in the skilled service or professional service in the State Personnel Management System under certain circumstances; requiring an appointing authority initiating a certain recruitment and appointment to notify the Department of Budget and Management of the recruitment; repealing certain time frames for the preparation of certain job announcements by certain appointing authorities for a certain position in State government; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0169
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel Recruitment Modernization Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel Recruitment Modernization Act of 2019
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   7-201, 7-203, 7-204, 7-205, 7-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page