Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county to impose a specified fee on business entities that own real or personal property in the county; requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to collect and remit the fee revenue to the counties; prohibiting the fee from exceeding specified amounts; requiring a county governing body that imposes a fee to notify the Department on or before July 1 of the year preceding the year in which the fee will be collected; exempting specified personal property from the specified property tax; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-101, 7-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page