Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barve, Branch, Campos, Carter, Clippinger, Davis, Dumais, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Jackson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, McComas, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Tarlau, Vaughn, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, P. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "abuse" for purposes of provisions of law relating to domestic violence to include harassment, trespass, and malicious destruction of property under specified provisions of law if the person eligible for relief has not resided with the respondent for at least 7 days before the filing of the petition.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
(   4-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page