Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on residential or commercial real property equipped with security camera systems for the purpose of crime prevention and reduction; specifying the amount of the property tax credit, subject to a limit of $200 per security camera and an aggregate cap of $500 for a residential property and $750 for a commercial property; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page