Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness in the Department of Commerce to be the Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board; and altering the composition of the Board.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563699/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {563699/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Astle) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text - Chapter - Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring
(   3-101, 3-103 through 3-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page