Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law and Procedure - Sex Offenders and Possession of Child Pornography - Penalties and Registration Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Atterbeary, Conaway, Queen, Sanchez, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the criminal penalty for possession of child pornography; requiring specified sex offender registrants to receive and pay for specified psychological counseling services; establishing a term during which a specified sex offender registrant is required to participate in specified psychological counseling services; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0223
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law and Procedure - Sex Offenders and Possession of Child Pornography - Penalties and Registration Requirements
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-704.3, 11-706, 11-721 )
(   11-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page