Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance Law - Application to Direct Primary Care Agreements - Exclusion
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly and Saab
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "direct primary care agreement" as a written contract in which a primary care provider agrees to provide certain primary care services to a patient for a certain fee and for a certain period of time and that has certain elements; excluding a direct primary care agreement from certain definitions for the purpose of certain provisions of insurance law; and providing that certain provisions of insurance law do not apply to a direct primary care agreement.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0718 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Insurance Law - Application to Direct Primary Care Agreements - Exclusion
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-103, 1-101, 11-601, 14-101.1, 15-101, 18-101, 31-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page