Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a defendant who is denied pretrial release by a District Court commissioner or who remains in custody under specified circumstances to waive presentment before a District Court judge; and requiring presentment to be immediate if the Court is in session.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1516 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page