Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Lopez, Charkoudian, Ivey, Johnson, R. Lewis, Love, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Queen, Shetty, Smith, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the June 30, 2019, termination date for a provision of law that increased from $250 to $500 the civil penalty for a violation recorded by a school bus monitoring camera for failure to stop for a school vehicle operating alternately flashing red lights.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0464
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
(   21-706, 21-706.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page