Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Elected Voting Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Conaway, R. Lewis, Mosby, Smith, and Wells
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of elected voting members on the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to six; requiring each elected voting member of the board to be elected from the six legislative districts of Baltimore City; establishing the terms of the elected voting members of the board; prohibiting a certain individual who has filed a certain certificate of candidacy from seeking appointment to the board or being appointed to the board by the Mayor of Baltimore City; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Elected Voting Members
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Elected Voting Members
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-108.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page