Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "police officer" in connection with provisions of law relating to the authority to make arrests to remove a member of the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation Police Force; providing for the transfer of certain functions, powers, and duties of the Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation Police Force to the Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services on June 30, 2019; providing for the transfer of certain employees to the Maryland Capitol Police; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text - Chapter - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page