Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Damascus - Zoning and Land Use Jurisdiction on Incorporation PG/MC 104-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Granting the Town of Damascus concurrent jurisdiction to enforce certain zoning laws within its boundaries; requiring a two-thirds majority vote of the district council and the county planning board for certain zoning action to be taken within the Town of Damascus; requiring a two-thirds majority vote of the county planning board for certain land use planning action to be taken within the Town of Damascus; and making the Act contingent on the incorporation of Damascus as a municipality by December 31, 2028.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Damascus - Zoning and Land Use Jurisdiction on Incorporation PG/MC 104-18
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   24-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page