Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Elections from approving a contract with an election service provider unless the contract requires the provider to report to the State Administrator of Elections if any stage in the manufacturing of a component of the provider's election system occurred outside the United States or if any material change to a component in any stage in the manufacturing of an election system occurred outside the United States; requiring a certain report by the election service provider to the State Administrator; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Security of Election Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {705761/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Security of Election Systems
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {705761/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
(   2-110 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page