Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a Class GC (golf course) license in Charles County and establishing a Class GC (golf course) privilege; specifying that an owner or operator of a public or private golf course has a golf course privilege to sell alcoholic beverages on the golf course if the owner or operator holds a certain class of license and pays a $200 annual fee; and specifying that the privilege expands the licensed premises to include the golf course.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
(   18-1003, 18-102, 18-1101.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page