Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Morgan, and Saab
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a procurement contract for architectural or engineering services from containing a certain indemnity clause unless a negligent performance standard is used for apportioning liability; and defining "negligent performance".
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0429
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page