Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Assisted Living Education on Influenza
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each assisted living program to provide its residents with educational material on the influenza virus on or before September 1 each year; requiring that the educational material include certain information; and prohibiting an assisted living program from being required to pay for or provide an influenza virus vaccine, unless otherwise required by law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0694
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Assisted Living Education on Influenza
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Assisted Living Education on Influenza
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page