Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Interstate Pipeline Liability Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Korman, Lierman, Moon, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the operation of an interstate pipeline facility is an ultrahazardous and abnormally dangerous activity; establishing that a pipeline operator is strictly liable for certain damages resulting from or occurring in connection with the operation of an interstate pipeline facility in the State; establishing that a pipeline operator is not liable for damages resulting from deliberate sabotage, acts of terrorism, or an act of war; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0100
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Interstate Pipeline Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary Economic Matters
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Civil Actions - Interstate Pipeline Liability Act
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Reassigned to Judiciary Economic Matters 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   12-301.1, 3-2201 through 3-2204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page